Senate | 08/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.267 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.488 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a6812c | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5608C | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.706 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5608B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5608A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.701 |