Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5618C | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5618B | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 10/04/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5618A | ||
Senate | 10/04/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |