Senate | 05/18/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2873A | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.764 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5621A | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |