Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.592 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.330 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | substituted for a1976 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1034 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |