Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.242 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |