Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.825 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |