Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.599 |