Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.461 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.694 |