Senate | 05/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.852 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1504 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5728A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |