Senate | 12/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.50 | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.707 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | substituted for a5639 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1106 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |