Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.653 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a5898e | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1642 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5779E | ||
Senate | 05/31/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5779D | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5779C | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5779B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5779A |