Senate | 05/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5784A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1236 |