Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.436 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.441 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a3486a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1574 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5795A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |