Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.575 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.592 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a3498a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1091 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5808A | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1244 |