Senate | 08/29/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.294 | ||
Senate | 08/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.70 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | substituted for a6205a | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.168 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5815A | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.854 |