Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.539 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5817B | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5817A |