Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5610D | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5823C | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.663 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5823B | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5823A | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |