Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5801 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.605 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |