Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.377 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.311 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a5794c | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED 5850C | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1227 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5850B | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5850A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.804 |