Senate | 12/21/2024 | VETOED MEMO.132 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.393 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a7491b | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1690 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5868B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5868A | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |