Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.593 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.765 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a5549a | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to housing | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5881A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.600 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |