Assembly | 05/20/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.254 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.754 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a3827 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.601 |