Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1750 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5909B | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5909A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |