Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4060A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1759 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5910B | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5910A | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |