Senate | 11/17/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.31 | ||
Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.662 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.667 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a113a | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.707 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5913A | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |