Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.153 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.486 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a6138 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.716 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.648 |