Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.795 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5936A | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |