Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4924B | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5937B | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.462 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5937A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1011 |