Senate | 08/06/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.217 | ||
Senate | 08/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.23 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | substituted for a725 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.7 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.781 |