Assembly | 03/28/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.695 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1576 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5955A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |