Senate | 09/15/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.8 | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.438 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.704 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a5718b | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5959B | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1188 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5959A | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |