Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6807 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1212 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5986A | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES |