Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.83 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.654 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.230 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | substituted for a7606 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.100 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1261 | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5991A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |