Assembly | 03/21/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | AMENDED 6007A | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.143 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.649 |