Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.439 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.369 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted for a5869a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6026A | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.702 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |