Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1349 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6045A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |