Senate | 04/10/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.123 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | substituted for a5983 | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.572 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |