Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1253 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6118A | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |