New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06121 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/30/2023

   
  STATE OF NEW YORK ________________________________________________________________________ 6121 2023-2024 Regular Sessions  IN SENATE March 30, 2023 ___________ Introduced by Sen. MARTINEZ -- read twice and ordered printed, and when printed to be committed to the Committee on Investigations and Govern- ment Operations AN ACT directing the commissioner of taxation and finance to grant an automatic extension until May 15, 2023 for counties affected by a severe winter storm in December 2022 The People of the State of New York, represented in Senate and Assem- bly, do enact as follows: 1 Section 1. Automatic extension for counties affected by severe winter 2 storm. Notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, the commissioner 3 of taxation and finance shall grant an automatic extension until May 15, 4 2023 for filing a tax return or paying a tax otherwise required on or 5 after December 23, 2022 and before May 15, 2023 for individuals and 6 households who reside or have a business in the counties of Erie, Gene- 7 see, Niagara, St. Lawrence, and Suffolk counties which were affected by 8 the severe winter storm and snowstorm beginning December 23, 2022 and 9 ending December 28, 2022. No penalties or interest shall be assessed or 10 imposed upon a taxpayer during such extension as granted in this 11 section. 12 § 2. This act shall take effect immediately. EXPLANATION--Matter in italics (underscored) is new; matter in brackets [ ] is old law to be omitted. LBD10599-01-3