Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.731 |