Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5729A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.880 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6146A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |