Senate | 08/23/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.329 | ||
Senate | 08/11/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.881 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a6387 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.935 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |