Senate | 11/22/2024 | VETOED MEMO.60 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.453 | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | substituted for a6845 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.652 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.745 |