Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.442 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.584 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | substituted for a5808 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1382 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |