Senate | 05/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6169C | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6169B | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1812 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6169A |