Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.392 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a7052c | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.8 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6173B | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1383 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6173A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |