Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.443 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.882 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a6426b | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1850 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6177B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6177A | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |