Senate | 05/31/2023 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.938 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |