Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a7737a | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 6210B | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1683 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6210A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |