Senate | 12/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.51 | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.709 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.766 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a5791a | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6238A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.870 |